No. 17-21
Title:Fane Lozman, Petitioner
v.
City of Riviera Beach, Florida
Docketed:June 30, 2017
Linked with 16A1100
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-10550)
   Decision Date:February 28, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 09 2017Application (16A1100) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 29, 2017 to June 28, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
May 15 2017Application (16A1100) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 28, 2017.
Jun 28 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 31, 2017)
Jul 28 2017Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Jul 28 2017Waiver of right of respondent Riviera Beach, FL to respond filed.
Jul 31 2017Brief amicus curiae of First Amendment Foundation filed.
Aug 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Aug 10 2017Response Requested. (Due September 11, 2017)
Aug 16 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 11, 2017.
Oct 11 2017Brief of respondent Riviera Beach, FL in opposition filed.
Oct 18 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2017.
Oct 18 2017Reply of petitioner Fane Lozman filed. (Distributed)
Nov 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2017.
Nov 13 2017Petition GRANTED.
Dec 19 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Fane Lozman
Blanket Consent
Dec 20 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, February 27, 2018
Dec 22 2017Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 22 2017Brief of petitioner Fane Lozman filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2017Brief amici curiae of Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2017Brief amici curiae of Marion B. Brechner First Amendment Project, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 29 2017Brief amici curiae of First Amendment Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 29 2017Brief amici curiae of Institute for Justice, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 29 2017Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Dec 29 2017Brief amici curiae of National Press Photographers Association and 25 Media and Free Speech Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2018CIRCULATED
Jan 09 2018Motion of respondent for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
Jan 10 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit.
Jan 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file respondent's brief on the merits granted, and the time is extended to and including January 26, 2018. Amicus briefs in support of respondent are to be filed on or before January 29, 2018.
Jan 22 2018Record received from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of Florida (West Palm Beach) is electronic.
Jan 24 2018Record from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of Florida. (1 Envelope).
Jan 26 2018Brief of respondent Riviera Beach, FL filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of State of Alaska filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 29 2018Brief amici curiae of District of Columbia, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2018Brief amici curiae of National Association of Counties, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 02 2018Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 16 2018Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Feb 16 2018Reply of petitioner Fane Lozman filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2018Argued. For petitioner: Pamela S. Karlan, Stanford, Cal. For respondent: Shay Dvoretzky, Washington, D. C.; and Jeffrey B. Wall, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)
Jun 18 2018Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Kennedy, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Ginsburg, Breyer, Alito, Sotomayor, Kagan, and Gorsuch, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion.
Jun 21 2018Statement of Costs filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Pamela Susan Karlan
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305-8610

karlan@stanford.edu
(650) 724-1900
Party name: Fane Lozman
Attorneys for Respondent
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

(202)-879-3939
Party name: Riviera Beach, FL
Other
Floyd Abrams
    Counsel of Record
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
80 Pine Street
New York, NY 10005

fabrams@cahill.com
212-701-3621
Party name: Institute for Free Speech
Loren L. AliKhan
    Counsel of Record
D.C. Office of the Attorney General
Deputy Solicitor General
441 4th St., NW, Suite 600 South
Washington, DC 20001

loren.alikhan@dc.gov
202-727-6287
Party name: District of Columbia, et al.
Ginger D. Anders
    Counsel of Record
Munger Tolles & Olson
1155 F St. NW
7th floor
Washington, DC 20004

ginger.anders@mto.com
2022201107
Party name: First Amendment Foundation, et al.
Dario Borghesan
    Counsel of Record
State of Alaska Department of Law
1031 W. Fourth Ave. Suite 200
Anchorage, AK 99501

dario.borghesan@alaska.gov
(907) 269-5100
Party name: State of Alaska
Clay Calvert
    Counsel of Record
University of Florida
2060 Weimer Hall
PO Box 118400
Gainesville, FL 32611

ccalvert@jou.ufl.edu
5129069226
Party name: Marion B. Brechner First Amendment Project, et al.
Bennett L. Cohen
    Counsel of Record
Polsinelli, PC
1401 Lawrence St.
Suite 2300
303-572-9300, CO 80202

bcohen@polsinelli.com
(303)-572-9300
Party name: National Association of Counties, et al.
Robert Lawrence Corn-Revere
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
1919 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

bobcornrevere@dwt.com
202-973-4225
Party name: National Press Photographers Association and 25 Media and Free Speech Organizations
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mkimberly@mayerbrown.com
(202)-263-3000
Party name: Institute for Justice, et al.
David Michael Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
375 East Chicago Avenue
Chicago, IL 60611

david.shapiro@law.northwestern.edu
312-503-0711
Party name: Roderick and Solange Macarthur Justice Center
Jeffrey Bryan Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

charlene.w.goodwin@usdoj.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States