No. 17-204
Title:Apple Inc., Petitioner
v.
Robert Pepper, et al.
Docketed:August 7, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-15000)
   Decision Date:January 12, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:May 4, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 02 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 6, 2017)
Sep 06 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Washington Legal Foundation.
Sep 06 2017Brief of respondents Robert Pepper, et al. in opposition filed.
Sep 06 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by ACT The App Association.
Sep 15 2017Objection to motions of the App Association and the Washington Legal Foundation to fie briefs in support of petitioner from respondents Robert Pepper, et al. filed.
Sep 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Sep 20 2017Reply of petitioner Apple Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 10 2017The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 08 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
May 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by ACT The App Association GRANTED.
Jun 18 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Washington Legal Foundation GRANTED.
Jun 18 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jun 25 2018Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 03 2018Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 10, 2018. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 24, 2018.
Aug 07 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Robert Pepper, et al.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Aug 10 2018Brief of petitioner Apple Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 10 2018Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs received.)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of R Street Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2018Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2018Brief amicus curiae of Computer & Communications Industry Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2018Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2018Amicus brief of ACT The App Association submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 17 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 17 2018Amicus brief of BSA | The Software Alliance submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2018Amicus brief of VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS INC. submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel M. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000
San Francisco, CA 94111

dan.wall@lw.com
(415) 391-0600
Party name: Apple Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: Robert Pepper, et al.
Other
Cory L. Andrews
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

candrews@wlf.org
2025880302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tboutrous@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7804
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Beth Susan Brinkmann
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

bbrinkmann@cov.com
202-662-5312
Party name: Computer & Communications Industry Association
Charles Duan
    Counsel of Record
R Street Institute
1212 New York Ave NW Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

supremecourt.gov@cduan.com
2028610020
Party name: R Street Institute
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park, PLLC
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS INC.
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: BSA | The Software Alliance
Brian Eugene Scarpelli
    Counsel of Record
ACT The App Association
1401 K Street NW, Suite 501
Washington, DC 20005

bscarpelli@actionline.org
517-507-1446
Party name: ACT The App Association