No. 17-2
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Microsoft Corporation
Docketed:June 27, 2017
Linked with 16A972
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-2985)
   Decision Date:July 14, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:January 24, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 12 2017Application (16A972) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 24, 2017 to May 24, 2017, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Apr 12 2017Application (16A972) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until May 24, 2017.
May 12 2017Application (16A972) to extend further the time from May 24, 2017 to June 23, 2017, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
May 15 2017Application (16A972) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until June 23, 2017.
Jun 23 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 27, 2017)
Jul 20 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 28, 2017.
Jul 27 2017Brief amici curiae of The States of Vermont, et al. filed.
Aug 28 2017Brief of respondent Microsoft Corporation in opposition filed.
Sep 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Sep 13 2017Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Sep 15 2017Supplemental brief of respondent Microsoft Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Oct 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.
Oct 16 2017Petition GRANTED.
Nov 01 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including December 6, 2017.
Nov 01 2017The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including January 11, 2018.
Nov 09 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, United States
Nov 09 2017Blanket Consent filed by respondent, Microsoft Corporation.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
(212)-506-5000
Party name: Microsoft Corporation
Other
Benjamin Daniel Battles
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
109 State Street
Montpelier, VT 05609

benjamin.battles@vermont.gov
(802) 828-5500
Party name: The States of Vermont, et al.