No. 17-193 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Jefferson Dunn, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, Petitioner
v.
Vernon Madison
Docketed:August 4, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-12279)
   Decision Date:March 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:May 4, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 02 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 5, 2017)
Sep 05 2017Brief of respondent Vernon Madison in opposition filed.
Sep 05 2017Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Vernon Madison.
Sep 14 2017Reply of petitioner Jefferson Dunn, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections filed.
Sep 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Oct 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.
Oct 23 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2017.
Nov 06 2017Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Nov 06 2017Petition for certiorari GRANTED, judgment REVERSED. Opinion per curiam. (Detached Opinion). Justice Ginsburg, concurring. (Detached Opinion). Justice Breyer, concurring. (Detached Opinion).
Nov 16 2017Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 29 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew L. Brasher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Alabama Attorney General
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36130

abrasher@ago.state.al.us
(334) 242-7300
Party name: Jefferson Dunn, Comm'r, AL DOC
Attorneys for Respondent
Angela Leigh Setzer
    Counsel of Record
122 Commerce Street
Montgomery, AL 36104

334-269-1803
Party name: Vernon Madison