No. 17-178
Title:American Humanist Association, et al., Petitioners
v.
Birdville Independent School District, et al.
Docketed:August 2, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-11067, 16-11220)
   Decision Date:March 20, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:May 2, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 31 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 1, 2017)
Aug 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Center for Inquiry, et al. filed.
Aug 29 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 16, 2017.
Oct 16 2017Brief of respondents Birdville Independent School District, et al. in opposition filed.
Oct 30 2017Reply of petitioners American Humanist Association, et al. filed.
Nov 01 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Monica Lynn Miller
    Counsel of Record
American Humanist Association
1821 Jefferson Place NW
Washington, DC 20036

mmiller@americanhumanist.org
(202)238-9088
Party name: American Humanist Association, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
D. Craig Wood
    Counsel of Record
One International Centre
100 N.E. Loop 410, Suite 900
San Antonio, TX 78216

(210) 979-6633
Party name: Birdville Independent School District, et al.
Other
Edward Z. Tabash
    Counsel of Record
11500 West Olympic Blvd
Suite 400
Los Angeles, CA 90064

etabash@centerforinquiry.net
310-279-5120
Party name: The Center for Inquiry, et al.