No. 17-1717
Vide 18-18
Title:The American Legion, et al., Petitioners
v.
American Humanist Association, et al.
Docketed:June 27, 2018
Linked with 17A1201, 18A653
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-2597)
   Decision Date:October 18, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:March 1, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 30 2018Application (17A1201) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 30, 2018 to June 29, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 03 2018Application (17A1201) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 29, 2018.
Jun 25 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 27, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 12 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, The American Legion, et al..
Blanket Consent
Jul 13 2018Blanket Consent received from counsel of record for Respondent, Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission filed.
Blanket Consent
Jul 25 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law & Justice filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of Military Order of the Purple Heart filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty filed. VIDED.(Corrected brief to be resubmitted)
Jul 27 2018Brief amici curiae of Retired Generals and Flag Officers filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2018Brief amici curiae of Major General Patrick Brady and Veterans Groups Erecting and Maintaining War Memorials filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2018Brief amicus curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Islam and Religious Freedom Action Team of the Religious Freedom Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2018Brief amicus curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word CountOther
Jul 27 2018Brief amici curiae of 109 United States Senators and Members of the United States House of Representatives filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2018Brief of respondents American Humanist Association, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2018Brief amici curiae of Citizens United, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 27 2018Brief amicus curiae of Thomas More Law Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2018Brief amici curiae of State of West Virginia, 27 Other States & the Governor of Kentucky filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2018Brief amici curiae of Maryland Elected Officials filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2018Brief amici curiae of Medal of Honor Recipients filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2018Brief amici curiae of Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Town of Taos, New Mexico filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2018Corrected brief amici curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2018Reply of petitioners The American Legion, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.
Nov 02 2018Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 18-18 is granted. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Nov 02 2018Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 17-1717. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 17-1717. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the flings is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Dec 03 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, American Humanist Association, et al..
Blanket Consent
Dec 03 2018Blanket Consent filed by Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Dec 04 2018Blanket Consent filed by The American Legion, et al. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Dec 17 2018Application (18A653) of respondents to file a consolidated brief on the merits in excess of the word limit, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 17 2018Joint appendix filed (4 volumes). (Statement of costs filed). VIDED.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Dec 17 2018Brief of petitioners The American Legion, et al. filed (in 17-1717).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2018Brief of petitioner Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission filed (in 18-18).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2018Motion of respondents for an extension of time filed. VIDED.
Main Document
Dec 18 2018Brief amici curiae of American Association of Christian Schools, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2018Brief amicus curiae of Town of Taos, New Mexico filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2018Brief amicus curiae of Thomas More Law Center filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2018Brief amicus curiae of Justice and Freedom Fund filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed (in 17-1717).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of Maryland filed (in 18-18).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, February 27, 2019. VIDED.
Dec 21 2018Motion of the respondents for an extension of time to file respondents' brief/s on the merits is granted in part and the time is extended to and including January 23, 2019. VIDED.
Dec 21 2018Application (18A653) to file a consolidated brief on the merits in excess of the word limit granted by The Chief Justice.
Dec 21 2018Brief amici curiae of Retired Generals and Flag Officers filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Utah Highway Patrol Association filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Brief amici curiae of Citizens United and Citizens United Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Brief amici curiae of Medal of Honor Recipients filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Brief amici curiae of Public Advocate of the United States, et al. filed (in 17-1717).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Brief amici curiae of National Association of Counties, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of Family Research Council filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Brief amici curiae of The National Jewish Commission on Law and Public Affairs ("COLPA"), et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Brief amici curiae of Family Members of Soldiers Named on the Peace Cross filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 21 2018Amicus brief of Major General Patrick Brady and Veterans Groups Erecting and Maintaining War Memorials not accepted for filing. (Corrected certificate of compliance submitted - December 28, 2018)
Dec 21 2018Brief amici curiae of Major General Patrick Brady and Veterans Groups Erecting and Maintaining War Memorials filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Brief amici curiae of Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Brief amici curiae of American Center for Law & Justice, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Counsel filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 24 2018Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 24 2018Brief amici curiae of State of West Virginia and 29 Other States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 24 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of Kamal S. Kalsi filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of The American Civil Rights Union filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Various Professors filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2018Brief amici curiae of 84 United States Senators and Members of the United States House of Representatives filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Veterans in Defense of Liberty, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Professors Walter Dellinger and Martin S. Lederman in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Islam and Religious Freedom Action Team of the Religious Freedom Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of CatholicVote.org Education Fund filed. (in 17-1717).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Maryland Elected Officials and Prince George's County filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of Military Order of the Purple Heart filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 26 2018Amicus brief of Religious Denominations and Other Religious Institutions not accepted for filing. (January 07, 2019)
Dec 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Religious Denominations and Other Religious Institutions filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 09 2019Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 09 2019Joint motion of petitioners for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 11 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit.
Jan 15 2019CIRCULATED
Jan 17 2019Record from the U.S.D.C. District of Maryland Southern Division is electronic and located on PACER.
Jan 22 2019Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Jan 22 2019Joint motion of petitioners for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument GRANTED and the time is divided as follows: 15 minutes for petitioner in No. 18-18, 10 minutes for petitioners in No. 17-1717, 10 minutes for the Acting Solicitor General as amicus curiae, and 35 minutes for respondents. VIDED.
Jan 23 2019Brief of respondent American Humanist Association, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 30 2019Brief amici curiae of Religious and Civil-Rights Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2019Amicus brief of Law Professors not accepted for filing. (February 11, 2019) (Corrected version Submitted)
Jan 30 2019Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed (2/11/19). VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2019Brief amicus curiae of Jewish War Veterans of the United States of America, Inc. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2019Brief amicus curiae of Muslim Advocates filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2019Brief amici curiae of Historians and Legal Scholars filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2019Brief amici curiae of Military Religious Freedom Foundation, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2019Brief amici curiae of Freedom from Religion Foundation, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2019Brief amici curiae of Baptist Joint Committee for Religious Liberty, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 13 2019Reply of petitioners The American Legion, et al. filed (in 17-1717). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 13 2019Reply of petitioner Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission filed (in 18-18). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 21 2019Letter from State of Rhode Island regarding amici brief of State of West Virginia and 29 Other States filed on December 24, 2018 received. VIDED. (Distributed).
Feb 27 2019Argued. For petitioner in 18-18: Neal K. Katyal, Washington, D. C. For petitioners in 17-1717: Michael A. Carvin, Washington, D. C. For United States, as amicus curiae, supporting petitioners: Jeffrey B. Wall, Acting Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Monica L. Miller, Washington, D. C. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael A. Carvin
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

macarvin@jonesday.com
(202) 879-7643
Party name: The American Legion, et al.
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Attorneys for Respondents
Monica Lynn Miller
    Counsel of Record
American Humanist Association
1821 Jefferson Place NW
Washington, DC 20036

mmiller@americanhumanist.org
2022389088
Party name: American Humanist Association, et al.
Other
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste. 430
Washington, DC 20004

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3883
Party name: Veterans in Defense of Liberty, et al.
Miles Edward Coleman
    Counsel of Record
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP
1320 Main Street, 17 Floor
Columbia, SC 29201

miles.coleman@nelsonmullins.com
(803)799-2000
Party name: The Islam and Religious Freedom Action Team of the Religious Freedom Institute
Charles Justin Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ccooper@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: 109 United States Senators and Members of the United States House of Representatives
Charles Justin Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ccooper@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: 84 United States Senators and Members of the United States House of Representatives
David Andrew Cortman
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

dcortman@adflegal.org
(202) 393-8690
Party name: Major General Patrick Brady and Veterans Groups Erecting and Maintaining War Memorials
Matthew James Dowd
    Counsel of Record
Dowd PLLC
1717 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 1025
Washington, DC 20006

mdowd@dowdscheffel.com
202-573-3853
Party name: Military Order of the Purple Heart
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
3343241812
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Richard Michael Esenberg
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty
Bloodgood House, 1139 E. Knapp Street
Milwaukee, WI 53202

rick@will-law.org
414-727-9455
Party name: Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty
Scott William Gaylord
    Counsel of Record
Elon University School of Law
201 North Greene Street
Greensboro, NC 27401

sgaylord@elon.edu
3362799331
Party name: CatholicVote.org Education Fund
John Robert Grimm
    Counsel of Record
Maryland Office of the Attorney General
Civil Litigation Division
200 St. Paul Place
Baltimore, MD 21202

jgrimm@oag.state.md.us
410-576-6339
Party name: Maryland
Jeffrey Matthew Harris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC
3033 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

jeff@consovoymccarthy.com
732-439-423
Party name: Maryland Elected Officials
James L. Hirsen
    Counsel of Record
Suite 300
505 S. Villa Real Drive,
Suite 208
Anaheim Hills, CA 92807

james@jameshirsen.com
714-614-0401
Party name: Justice and Freedom Fund
Allyson Ho
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
2100 McKinney Avenue
Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75201

aho@gibsondunn.com
214-698-3233
Party name: The Utah Highway Patrol Association
Robert Stanton Jones
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20001

stanton.jones@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5563
Party name: Muslim Advocates
Richard Brian Katskee
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Separation of Church and State
1310 L Street, NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20005

katskee@au.org
202-466-3234
Party name: Religious and Civil-Rights Organizations
Daniel Patrick Kearney Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20006

Daniel.Kearney@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty
Erin Jude Kuenzig
    Counsel of Record
24 Frank Lloyd Wright Drive
P.O. Box 393
Ann Arbor, MI 48106

erinkuenzig@gmail.com
734-827-2001
Party name: Thomas More Law Center
Harold Douglas Laycock
    Counsel of Record
University of Texas Law School
727 E. Dean Keeton St.
Austin, TX 78705

DLAYCOCK@VIRGINIA.EDU
512-232-1224
Party name: Baptist Joint Committee for Religious Liberty et al.
Martin Seth Lederman
    Counsel of Record
NA
600 New Jersey Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

martin.lederman@law.georgetown.edu
3012216618
Party name: Walter Dellinger and Martin S. Lederman
Martin Seth Lederman
    Counsel of Record
N/A
600 New Jersey Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

martin.lederman@law.georgetown.edu
3012216618
Party name: Professors Walter Dellinger and Martin S. Lederman
Nathan Lewin
    Counsel of Record
Lewin & Lewin, LLP
888 17th St. NW, 4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

nat@lewinlewin.com
2028281000
Party name: THE NATIONAL JEWISH COMMISSION ON LAW AND PUBLIC AFFAIRS
Michael J. Lockerby
    Counsel of Record
Foley & Lardner LLP
Washington Harbour
3000 K Street, N.W., Suite 600
Washington, DC 20007-5109

mlockerby@foley.com
202-945-6079
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Christopher C. Lund
    Counsel of Record
471 W. Palmer St.
Detroit, MI 48202

lund@wayne.edu
2022771264
Party name: LAW PROFESSORS
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park, PLLC
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: MARYLAND ELECTED OFFICIALS AND PRINCE GEORGE’S COUNTY
Michael W. McConnell
    Counsel of Record
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

mcconnell@law.stanford.edu
(202) 879-5000
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
R. Timothy McCrum
    Counsel of Record
Crowell & Moring, LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Avenue
N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-2595

rmccrum@crowell.com
202-624-2752
Party name: Town of Taos, New Mexico
Matthew Dempsey McGill
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

mmcgill@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3680
Party name: Citizens United and Citizens United Foundation
Brian Himanshu Pandya
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein, LLP
1776 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

bpandya@wileyrein.com
(202) 719-7457
Party name: Medal of Honor Recipients
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack Park
616-B Green Street
Suite 2200
Gainesville, GA 30501

jjp@jackparklaw.com
470-892-6444
Party name: The American Civil Rights Union
Zachary Guy Parks
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 Tenth St. NW
Washington, DC 20001

zparks@cov.com
2022850524
Party name: Family Members of Soldiers Named on the Peace Cross
William Perry Pendley
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 South Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80277

wppendley@mountainstateslegal.com
303-292-2021
Party name: The Town of Taos, New Mexico
James Forrest Peterson
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
425 Third Street, SW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20024

jpeterson@judicialwatch.org
2026465175
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc.
Stephen Charles Piepgrass
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Sanders, LLP
1001 Haxall Point. P.O. Box 1122
Richmond, VA 23219

stephen.piepgrass@troutman.com
8046971320
Party name: Professor Hadley Arkes, et al.
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Religious Denominations and Other Religious Institutions
Lindsay Sara See
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
1900 Kanawha Blvd E, Bldg 1 Rm 26E
Charleston, WV 25305

lindsay.s.see@wvago.gov
304-558-2021
Party name: State of West Virginia, 27 Other States & the Governor of Kentucky
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
202-546-8890
Party name: American Center for Law & Justice
Sarah M. Shalf
    Counsel of Record
Emory University School of Law
Gambrell Hall
1301 Clifton Road NE
Atlanta, GA 30322-2770

sarah.shalf@emory.edu
404-712-4652
Party name: Military Religious Freedom Foundation, et al.
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: Cato Institute
Tejinder Singh
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tsingh@goldsteinrussell.com
2023620636
Party name: Kamal S. Kalsi
Mathew D. Staver
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 540774
Orlando, FL 32854

mat@lc.org
407-875-1776
Party name: Liberty Counsel
Aaron Michael Streett
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX 77002

aaron.streett@bakerbotts.com
713-229-1855
Party name: Retired Generals and Flag Officers
Herbert William Titus
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

htitus@cox.net
7033565070
Party name: Public Advocate of the United States, et al.
William Wagner
    Counsel of Record
Great Lakes Justice Center
5600 W. Mount Hope Hwy.
Upper Level
Lansing, MI 48917

Prof.WWJD@gmail.com
517-643-1765
Party name: American Association of Christian Schools, et al.
Jeffrey Bryan Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

charlene.w.goodwin@usdoj.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Travis Suren Weber
    Counsel of Record
Family Research Council
801 G Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

tsw@frc.org
202-637-4617
Party name: Family Research Council
Harvey Weiner
    Counsel of Record
Peabody & Arnold
One Beacon Street
Boston, MA 02108-0000

hweiner@peabodyarnold.com
202-265-6280
Party name: Jewish War Veterans of the United States of America, Inc.
Paul J. Zidlicky
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

pzidlicky@sidley.com
202-736-8000
Party name: National Association of Counties, et al.
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States, et al.
Luke W. GoodrichThe Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

lgoodrich@becketlaw.org
202-349-7216
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Robert Mark Loeb
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

rloeb@orrick.com
202-339-8475
Party name: Freedom from Religion Foundation, Center for Inquiry, American Atheists, Inc., Military Association of Atheists and Freethinkers, Secular Coalition of America
Charles Rothfeld
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K St NW
Washington, DC 20006

crothfeld@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3233
Party name: Historians and Legal Scholars