No. 17-1713
Title:Emerson Electric Co., et al., Petitioners
v.
Superior Court of California, Orange County, et al.
Docketed:June 27, 2018
Linked with 17A1191
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of California
   Case Numbers:(S222314)
   Decision Date:February 8, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 27 2018Application (17A1191) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 9, 2018 to June 25, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 30 2018Application (17A1191) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until June 25, 2018.
Jun 25 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 27, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 27, 2018 to September 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 7, 2018.
Jul 27 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Manufacturers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2018Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2018Brief amici curiae of National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center and Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2018Brief of respondent People of the State of California in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2018Reply of Emerson Electric Co., et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins, LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Suite 500 - West
Washington, DC 20037

jelwood@velaw.com
2026396518
Party name: Emerson Electric Co., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kelly Ann Ernby
    Counsel of Record
Orange County District Attorney's Office
401 Civic Center Drive West
Santa Ana, CA 92701

kelly.ernby@da.ocgov.com
714-664-3985
Party name: People of the State of California
Other
Hyland Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

hhunt@deutschhunt.com
202-868-6915
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Cary Silverman
    Counsel of Record
Shook, Hardy and Bacon LLP
1155 F Street NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20004

csilverman@shb.com
202-783-8400
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers
Luke Anthony Wake
    Counsel of Record
NFIB Small Business Legal Center
1201 F St. N.W., Suite 200
Washington, DC 20004

luke.wake@nfib.org
202-314-2061
Party name: National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center and Southeastern Legal Foundation