No. 17-1712
Title:James J. Thole, et al., Petitioners
v.
U.S. Bank, N.A., et al.
Docketed:June 27, 2018
Linked with 17A1210
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1928)
   Decision Date:October 12, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:February 22, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 01 2018Application (17A1210) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 23, 2018 to July 20, 2018, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 03 2018Application (17A1210) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until June 22, 2018.
Jun 22 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 27, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 27, 2018 to August 27, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 27, 2018.
Aug 22 2018Brief of respondents U.S. Bank, N.A., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 05 2018Reply of petitioners James J. Thole, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 21 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jun 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 04 2019Supplemental brief of respondents U.S. Bank, N.A., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.
Jun 28 2019Petition GRANTED. In addition to the questions presented by the petition, the parties are directed to brief and argue the following question: Whether petitioners have demonstrated Article III standing.
Jul 03 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 16 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 11, 2019. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including November 12, 2019.
Sep 04 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, James J. Thole, et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 11 2019Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed.)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 11 2019Brief of petitioners James J. Thole, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2019Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Sep 17 2019Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Sep 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pension Rights Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Home Builders in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Brief amici curiae of AARP and AARP Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 08 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, January 13, 2020.
Nov 12 2019Brief of respondents U.S. Bank, N.A., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 18 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundatoin filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 19 2019Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, The American Benefits Council, and The ERISA Industry Committee filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2019CIRCULATED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Peter K. Stris
    Counsel of Record
Stris and Maher LLP
777 S. Figueroa Street
Suite 3850
Los Angeles, CA 90017

peter.stris@strismaher.com
213-995-6800
Party name: James J. Thole, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Joseph Russell Palmore
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

jpalmore@mofo.com
202-887-6940
Party name: U.S. Bank, N.A., et al.
Stephen Paul LuckeDorsey & Whitney LLP
50 South Sixth Street
Suite 1500
Minneapolis, MN 55402

lucke.steve@dorsey.com
612-343-7947
Party name: U.S. Bank, N.A., et al.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Brian David Netter
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

bnetter@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, The American Benefits Council, and The ERISA Industry Committee
Benjamin G. Robbins
    Counsel of Record
New England Legal Foundation
150 Lincoln Street
Boston, MA 02111-2504

benrobbins@nelfonline.org
6176953660
Party name: New England Legal Foundation
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-0000

rsamp@wlf.org
202-588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundatoin
Elizabeth Hopkins
    Counsel of Record
Kantor & Kantor, LLP
19839 Nordhoff Street
Northridge, CA 91324

ehopkins@kantorlaw.net
818 886-2525
Party name: Pension Rights Center
Nandan Maheshchandra Joshi
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20009

njoshi@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen
Erin M. Riley
    Counsel of Record
Keller Rohrback, L.L.P.
1201 Third Avenue, Suite 3200
Seattle, WA 98101

eriley@kellerrohrback.com
206-623-1900
Party name: Law Professors
Dara Swartz Smith
    Counsel of Record
AARP Foundation Litigation
601 E St, . NW
Washington, DC 20049

dsmith@aarp.org
12024346280
Party name: AARP and AARP Foundation
Thomas Jon Ward
    Counsel of Record
National Association of Home Builders
1201 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

tward@nahb.org
202 266-8200
Party name: National Association of Home Builders