No. 17-1705
Title:PDR Network, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Carlton & Harris Chiropractic, Inc.
Docketed:June 26, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-2185)
   Decision Date:February 23, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 23, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 26, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 11 2018Waiver of right of respondent Carlton & Harris Chiropractic, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Aug 01 2018Response Requested. (Due August 31, 2018)
Aug 29 2018Brief of respondent Carlton & Harris Chiropractic, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Reply of petitioners PDR Network, LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.
Nov 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.
Nov 13 2018Petition GRANTED limited to the following question: Whether the Hobbs Act required the district court in this case to accept the FCC's legal interpretation of the Telephone Consumer Protection Act.
Nov 27 2018Motion for an extension of time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including January 8, 2019.
Nov 29 2018Motion of PDR Network, LLC, et al. to dispense with joint appendix submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey Neal Rosenthal
    Counsel of Record
Blank Rome LLP
One Logan Square, 130 N. 18th Street
Philadelphia, PA 19103

rosenthal-j@blankrome.com
2155695553
Party name: PDR Network, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Glenn L. Hara
    Counsel of Record
Anderson + Wanca
3701 Algonquin Road, Suite 500
Rolling Meadows, IL 60008

ghara@andersonwanca.com
(847) 368-1500
Party name: Carlton & Harris Chiropractic, Inc.