No. 17-1702
Title:Manhattan Community Access Corporation, et al., Petitioners
v.
DeeDee Halleck, et al.
Docketed:June 25, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4155)
   Decision Date:February 9, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 23, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 25, 2018)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 24, 2018.
Jul 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 25, 2018 to August 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 20 2018Blanket Consent received from counsel for Petitioners, Manhattan Community Access Corporation, et al. filed.
Blanket Consent
Jul 25 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 25 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Chicago Access Corporation.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2018Brief of respondents Deedee Halleck, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2018Reply of petitioners Manhattan Community Access Corporation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 12 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Chicago Access Corporation GRANTED.
Oct 12 2018Petition GRANTED.
Oct 24 2018Joint motion of the parties for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Nov 08 2018Joint supplement to motion for extension of time filed.
Main Document
Nov 15 2018Joint motion of the parties to file the brief on the merits is granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including December 4, 2018. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including January 11, 2019. The reply brief is to be filed in compliance with Rule 25.3.
Dec 04 2018Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 04 2018Brief of petitioners Manhattan Community Access Corporation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael B. de Leeuw
    Counsel of Record
Cozen O'Connor
45 Broadway Atrium
16th Floor
New York, NY 10006

mdeleeuw@cozen.com
(212) 908-1331
Party name: Manhattan Community Access Corporation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jamison Michael Isaac Davies
    Counsel of Record
New York City Law Department - Appeals Division
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10036

jdavies@law.nyc.gov
2123562490
Party name: City of New York
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

PHughes@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: DEEDEE HALLECK, et al.
Other
David John Debold
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

ddebold@gibsondunn.com
2029558551
Party name: The Cato Institute
Erin E. Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

erin.murphy@kirkland.com
2028795000
Party name: Chicago Access Corporation