No. 17-1701
Title:Wei Sun, Petitioner
v.
Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General
Docketed:June 25, 2018
Linked with 17A1215
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-2342)
   Decision Date:February 23, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 03 2018Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
May 03 2018Application (17A1215) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 24, 2018 to June 25, 2018, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
May 04 2018Application (17A1215) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until June 25, 2018.
Jun 25 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 25, 2018)
Jul 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 24, 2018.
Jul 19 2018Motion of Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (July 19, 2018 - Motion was submitted electronically, to be submitted in paper form only)
Jul 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 25, 2018 to August 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Aug 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 24, 2018 to September 14, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Aug 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 14, 2018.
Sep 14 2018Brief of respondent Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General in opposition filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew Eben Price
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave. NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

MPrice@jenner.com
Party name: Wei Sun
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General