No. 17-1700
Title:Michael C. Turzai, Speaker of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives, et al., Petitioners
v.
Gretchen Brandt, et al.
Docketed:June 25, 2018
Linked with 17A1120
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Middle District
   Case Numbers:(159 MM 2017)
   Decision Date:January 22, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 13 2018Application (17A1120) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 22, 2018 to June 21, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 16 2018Application (17A1120) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until June 21, 2018.
Jun 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 25, 2018)
PetitionAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 25, 2018 to September 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 24, 2018.
Jul 25 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Civil Rights Union filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
45 North Hill Dr., Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186

jt@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: Michael C. Turzai, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elisabeth Susan Theodore
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20001

elisabeth.theodore@apks.com
202-942-5891
Party name: Gretchen Brandt, et al.
Other
Scott Eric Gessler
    Counsel of Record
Klenda Gessler & Blue LLC
1624 Market Street
Suite 202
Denver, CO 80202

sgessler@klendagesslerblue.com
720-432-5705
Party name: American Civil Rights Union