No. 17-17
Title:Vickie Yates Brown Glisson, Secretary, Kentucky Cabinet for Health and Family Services, Petitioner
v.
D. O., et al.
Docketed:June 29, 2017
Linked with 16A973
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-5461)
   Decision Date:January 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 12 2017Application (16A973) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 27, 2017 to June 26, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Apr 13 2017Application (16A973) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 26, 2017.
Jun 26 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 31, 2017)
Jul 19 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 23, 2017.
Jul 26 2017Brief amici curiae of The States of Washington, et al. filed.
Aug 23 2017Brief of respondents D. O., et al. in opposition filed.
Aug 23 2017Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondents D. O., et al.
Sep 05 2017Reply of petitioner Vickie Yates Brown Glisson, Secretary for the Kentucky Cabinet for Health and Family Services filed.
Sep 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins, LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Suite 500 - West
Washington, DC 20037

jelwood@velaw.com
(202)-639-6500
Party name: Vickie Yates Brown Glisson, Secretary for the Kentucky Cabinet for Health and Family Services
John P. ElwoodVinson & Elkins LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Suite 500 West
Washington, DC 20037

jelwood@velaw.com
(202) 639-6500
Party name: Vickie Yates Brown Glisson, Secretary, Kentucky Cabinet for Health and Family Services
Attorneys for Respondents
Richard Frank Dawahare
    Counsel of Record
1795 Alysheba Way, Suite 2102
Lexington, KY 40509

rfdr@msn.com
859-543-0061
Party name: D. O., et al.
Other
Karl David SmithOffice of the Attorney General
1125 Washington Street, SE
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

KarlS@atg.wa.gov
360-586-6534
Party name: The States of Washington, et al.