No. 17-1695
Title:California State Teachers' Retirement System, et al., Petitioners
v.
Aida M. Alvarez, et al.
Docketed:June 21, 2018
Linked with 17A1104
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Delaware
   Case Numbers:(295, 2016)
   Decision Date:January 25, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 12 2018Application (17A1104) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 25, 2018 to June 22, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 15 2018Application (17A1104) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until June 22, 2018.
Jun 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 23, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 22, 2018
Jul 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 23, 2018 to August 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Council of Institutional Investors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 23 2018Brief amici curiae of Civil Procedure and Constitutional Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2018Brief of respondents Aida M. Alvarez, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 05 2018Reply of petitioners California State Teachers' Retirement System, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, N.W., Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7951
Party name: California State Teachers' Retirement System, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

tboutrous@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7000
Party name: Aida M. Alvarez, et al.
Other
Ryan Parker Bates
    Counsel of Record
Bates PLLC
919 Congress Avenue
Suite 750
Austin, TX 78701

rbates@batespllc.com
5126945268
Party name: The Council of Institutional Investors
Geoffrey Coyle Jarvis
    Counsel of Record
Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP
280 King of Prussia Road
Radnor, PA 19087

gjarvis@ktmc.com
610-667-7706
Party name: Civil Procedure and Constitutional Law Professors