No. 17-1693
Vide 17-1679
Title:Blue Water Navy Vietnam Veterans Association, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Robert Wilkie, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:June 21, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-1793)
   Decision Date:November 16, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:March 21, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 18 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 23, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 22, 2018.
Jul 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 23, 2018 to August 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 22, 2018 to September 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 30 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 7, 2018.
Sep 07 2018Brief of respondent Robert Wilkie, Secretary of Veterans Affairs in opposition filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 24 2018Reply of petitioner Blue Water Navy Vietnam Veterans Association, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Bennett Wells
    Counsel of Record
769 Robert Blvd., Suite 201D
Slidell, LA 70458

JohnLawEsq@msn.com
985-641-1855
Party name: Blue Water Navy Vietnam Veterans Association, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Robert Wilkie, Secretary of Veterans Affairs