No. 17-1692
Title:Mostafa R. Ahsan, Petitioner
v.
Staples the Office Superstore East, Inc.
Docketed:June 21, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4263)
   Decision Date:January 30, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 23, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 23, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 18 2018Motion of Staples the Office Superstore East, Inc. for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (July 23, 2018 - motion of July 18, 2018 was submitted twice.)
Jul 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 23, 2018 to August 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 22, 2018.
Aug 15 2018Waiver of right of respondent Staples the Office Superstore East, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 12 2018Response Requested. (Due October 12, 2018)
Sep 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 12, 2018 to November 13, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 13, 2018.
Oct 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 13, 2018 to December 6, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 6, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Roy Ortiz
    Counsel of Record
UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA SCHOOL OF LAW SUPREME COURT LITIGATION CLINIC
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

dro@virginia.edu
4349243127
Party name: Mostafa R. Ahsan
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey Lawrence O'Hara
    Counsel of Record
Connell Foley LLP
1085 Raymond Boulevard
19th Floor
Newark, NJ 07102

johara@connellfoley.com
973-436-5800
Party name: Staples the Office Superstore East, Inc.