No. 17-1687
Title:Theodore E. Suhl, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 20, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4174)
   Decision Date:March 22, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 20, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 20, 2018 to August 20, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 20, 2018.
Jul 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of James Madison Center for Free Speech filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Sep 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 05 2018Reply of petitioner Theodore E. Suhl filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

kshanmugam@wc.com
(202) 434-5000
Party name: Theodore E. Suhl
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
James Bopp Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Bopp Law Firm, PC
The National Building
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN 47807

jboppjr@aol.com
8122322434
Party name: James Madison Center for Free Speech