No. 17-168
Title:Robin Antonick, Petitioner
v.
Electronic Arts, Inc.
Docketed:August 2, 2017
Linked with 16A1197
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-15298)
   Decision Date:November 22, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:March 16, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 01 2017Application (16A1197) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 14, 2017 to July 14, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Jun 07 2017Application (16A1197) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until July 14, 2017.
Jul 10 2017Application (16A1197) to extend further the time from July 14, 2017 to July 28, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Jul 14 2017Application (16A1197) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until July 28, 2017.
Jul 28 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 1, 2017)
Aug 22 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 2, 2017.
Sep 01 2017Brief amici curiae of Intellectual Property Law Professors filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert B. Carey
    Counsel of Record
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
11 West Jefferson Street, Suite 1000
Phoenix, AZ 85003

rob@hbsslaw.com
(602) 840-5900
Party name: Robert Antonick
Attorneys for Respondent
Steven A. Hirsch
    Counsel of Record
633 Battery Street
San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

shirsch@keker.com
(415)-391-5400
Party name: Electronic Arts Inc.
Other
Phillip Robert Malone
    Counsel of Record
Juelsgaard Intellectual Property and Innovation Cl
Mills Legal Clinic at Stanford Law School
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

pmalone@stanford.edu
650-725-6369
Party name: Intellectual Property Law Professors