No. 17-1679
Vide 17-1693
Title:Robert H. Gray, Petitioner
v.
Robert Wilkie, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:June 20, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-1782)
   Decision Date:November 16, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:March 21, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 20, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 20, 2018 to August 20, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 20, 2018.
Jul 20 2018Brief amici curiae of National Organization of Veterans' Advocates, Inc.(NOVA), et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Veterans Legal Services Program (NVLSP) filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 20, 2018 to September 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 30 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 7, 2018.
Sep 07 2018Brief of respondent Robert Wilkie, Secretary of Veterans Affairs in opposition filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 25 2018Reply of petitioner Robert Gray filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 10 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Robert Gray filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.
Nov 02 2018Petition GRANTED.
Dec 07 2018Brief amicus curiae of Jeremy C. Doerre filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2018Brief of petitioner Robert Gray filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2018Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 17 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Robert Gray.
Blanket Consent
Dec 20 2018Amicus brief of Natioinal Law School Veterans Clinic Consortium not accepted for filing. (December 20, 2018 -- Corrected version submitted)
Dec 20 2018Amicus brief of Natioinal Law School Veterans Clinic Consortium not accepted for filing. (December 20, 2018 -- Corrected version submitted)
Dec 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Law School Veterans Clinic Consortium filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, February 25, 2019.
Dec 21 2018Brief amici curiae of National Organization of Veterans' Advocates, Inc.(NOVA), et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Brief amici curiae of National Veterans Legal Services Program (NVLSP), et al. filed.
Main Document
Dec 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of Blue Water Navy Vietnam Veterans Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 11 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. Federal Circuit.
Jan 15 2019CIRCULATED
Jan 16 2019Brief of respondent Robert Wilkie, Secretary of Veterans Affairs filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Roman Martinez
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

roman.martinez@lw.com
202-637-2200
Party name: Robert Gray
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Robert Wilkie, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Other
Christine Arezu Khalili-Borna Clemens
    Counsel of Record
Finkelstein & Partners, LLP
Veterans' Services Group
1279 Route 300, P.O. Box 1111
Newburgh, NY 12551

cclemens@lawampm.com
845-562-0203
Party name: National Organization of Veterans' Advocates, Inc.(NOVA), et al.
Jeremy Cooper Doerre
    Counsel of Record
Tillman Wright, PLLC
11325 N. Community House Road, Suite 250
Charlotte, NC 28277

jdoerre@ti-law.com
7042484883
Party name: Jeremy C. Doerre
Angela K. Drake
    Counsel of Record
The Veterans Clinic at the University of Missouri-Columbia School of Law
203 Hulston Hall
Columbia, MO 65211-4300

drakea@missouri.edu
573-882-7630
Party name: National Law School Veterans Clinic Consortium
Stephen Blake Kinnaird
    Counsel of Record
Paul Hastings LLP
875 15th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

stephenkinnaird@paulhastings.com
202-551-1842
Party name: National Veterans Legal Services Program (NVLSP) and Military Order of the Purple Heart, Inc.
John Bennett Wells
    Counsel of Record
Military-Veterans Advocacy
P O Box 5235
Slidell, LA 70469

JohnLawEsq@msn.com
985-641-1855
Party name: Blue Water Navy VietnamVeterans Association