No. 17-1678
Title:Jesus C. Hernández, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jesus Mesa, Jr.
Docketed:June 20, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(12-50217)
   Decision Date:March 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 15 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 20, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 20, 2018 to August 4, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of Government of the United Mexican States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of Professor Gregory C. Sisk filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 6, 2018.
Aug 06 2018Response to petition from respondent Jesus Mesa, Jr. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2018Reply of petitioner Jesus C. Hernández, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Stephen I. Vladeck
    Counsel of Record
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

svladeck@law.utexas.edu
5124759198
Party name: Jesus C. Hernández, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Randolph Joseph Ortega
    Counsel of Record
Ellis & Ortega
609 Myrtle Avenue
Suite 100
El Paso, TX 79901

randyortega@ellisandortega.com
915-542-1883
Party name: Jesus Mesa, Jr.
Other
Donald Francis Donovan
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
919 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022

dfdonovan@debevoise.com
(212) 909-6000
Party name: Government of the United Mexican States
David Sapir Lesser
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
7 World Trade Center
New York, NY 10007

David.Lesser@wilmerhale.com
2122308800
Party name: Professor Gregory C. Sisk