No. 17-1676
Title:Vanessa Stuart, Petitioner
v.
Alabama
Docketed:June 18, 2018
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama
   Case Numbers:(CR-16-0752)
   Decision Date:December 8, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:January 12, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 16, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 14 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 18, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 18, 2018 to August 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 10 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 17, 2018.
Aug 08 2018Brief of respondent State of Alabama in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2018Reply of petitioner Vanessa Stuart filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 18 2018Record Requested.
Sep 24 2018Record received from the Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama. The record is electronic.
Sep 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 10 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.
Nov 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.
Nov 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/16/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Samuel H. Heldman
    Counsel of Record
The Gardner Firm
2805 31st St. NW
Washington, DC 20008

sheldman@gmail.com
2029658884
Party name: Vanessa Stuart
Attorneys for Respondent
Beth Slate Poe
    Counsel of Record
AL Attorney General's Office
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36130-0000

bpoe@ago.state.al.us
334 242-7300
Party name: State of Alabama