No. 17-1672
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Andre Ralph Haymond
Docketed:June 15, 2018
Linked with 17A1065
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-5156)
   Decision Date:August 31, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:January 16, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 03 2018Application (17A1065) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 16, 2018 to May 16, 2018, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 04 2018Application (17A1065) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until May 16, 2018.
May 03 2018Application (17A1065) to extend further the time from May 16, 2018 to June 15, 2018, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Proof of ServiceWritten Request
May 03 2018Application (17A1065) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until June 15, 2018.
Jun 15 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 16, 2018)
PetitionProof of Service
Jun 28 2018Motion of Andre Ralph Haymond for an extension of time not accepted for filing (corrected version submitted). (June 29, 2018)
Jun 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 16, 2018 to August 15, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 29 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 15, 2018.
Aug 07 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 15, 2018 to September 14, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 14, 2018.
Sep 13 2018Brief of respondent Andre Ralph Haymond in opposition filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
Sep 13 2018Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Andre Ralph Haymond.
Main Document
Sep 26 2018Waiver of the 14-day waiting period pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by the Solicitor General.
Main Document
Sep 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Sep 26 2018Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 26 2018Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Oct 26 2018Petition GRANTED.
Nov 19 2018Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Nov 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits is granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including December 17, 2018. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including January 18, 2019.
Dec 06 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner United States.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 17 2018Brief of petitioner United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 21 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT for Tuesday, February 26, 2019.
Dec 21 2018Brief amici curiae of States of Utah, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Jan 11 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 10th Circuit.
Jan 15 2019CIRCULATED
Jan 16 2019Record from the U.S.C.A. 10th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER. The record is complete.
Jan 18 2019Brief of respondent Andre Ralph Haymond filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Andre Ralph Haymond.
Blanket Consent
Jan 25 2019Brief amici curiae of FAMM and the National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Due Process Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Social Science and Law Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2019Letter Proposing Material for Lodging of Andre Ralph Haymond not accepted for filing. (Request withdrawn as record material received from Tenth Circuit. February 19, 2019)
Feb 14 2019Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 26 2019Argued. For petitioner: Eric J. Feigin, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: William D. Lunn, Tulsa, Okla.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
William Dixon Lunn Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Attorney At Law
320 S. Boston, #1130
Tulsa, OK 74103

wlunn@peoplepc.com
918-582-9977
Party name: Andre Ralph Haymond
Other
David Thomas Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
DONAHUE, GOLDBERG & WEAVER, LLP
109 South 5th St., Suite 4201
Brooklyn, NY 11249

david@donahuegoldberg.com
212-334-8813
Party name: Due Process Institute
Tyler Green
    Counsel of Record
Utah Solicitor General
350 N. State Street, Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114-2320

tylergreen@agutah.gov
(801) 538-9600
Party name: States of Utah, et al.
Daniel E. Gustafson
    Counsel of Record
Gustafson Gluek, PLLC
Canadian Pacific Plaza
120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2600
Minneapolis, MN 55402

dgustafson@gustafsongluek.com
(612) 333-8844
Party name: Social Science and Law Scholars
Rakesh Nageswar Kilaru
    Counsel of Record
Wilkinson Walsh & Eskovitz LLP
2001 M St NW 10th Floor
Washington, DC 20036

rkilaru@wilkinsonwalsh.com
202-847-4000
Party name: FAMM and the National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers