No. 17-1662
Title:Aspen Insurance (UK) Ltd., et al., Petitioners
v.
Black & Veatch Corporation
Docketed:June 13, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3359)
   Decision Date:February 13, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 9, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 06 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 13, 2018)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 10 2018Brief of respondent Black & Veatch Corporation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOtherOther
Jul 13 2018Respondent's Rule 29.6 corporate disclosure statement received .

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Robert Jesse Franco
    Counsel of Record
Franco Moroney Buenik LLC
500 W. Madison St., Suite 2440
Chicago, IL 60661

robert.franco@francomoroney.com
3124668059
Party name: Aspen Insurance (UK) Ltd., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Bennett L. Cohen
    Counsel of Record
Polsinelli, PC
1401 Lawrence St.
Suite 2300
303-572-9300, CO 80202

bcohen@polsinelli.com
(303)-572-9300
Party name: Black & Veatch Corporation