No. 17-1660
Title:City of Escondido, California, et al., Petitioners
v.
Marty Emmons
Docketed:June 12, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-55771)
   Decision Date:March 29, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 08 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 12, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 11 2018Waiver of right of respondent Marty Emmons to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jul 25 2018Response Requested. (Due August 24, 2018)
Aug 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 24, 2018 to September 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 24, 2018.
Sep 24 2018Brief of respondent Marty Emmons in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 10 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.
Oct 31 2018Record Requested.
Nov 02 2018Record received from U.S.C.A. for the Ninth Circuit (one envelope). The remaining record is electronic and available on PACER.
Nov 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.
Nov 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/16/2018.
Nov 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Dec 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael Raymond McGuinness
    Counsel of Record
Office of the City Attorney
201 N. Broadway
Escondido, CA 92025

mmcguinness@escondido.org
(760) 839-4608
Party name: City of Escondido, California, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Gerald Blaine Singleton
    Counsel of Record
Singleton Law Firm
115 W Plaza St
Solana Beach, CA 92075

gerald@geraldsingleton.com
7606971330
Party name: Marty Emmons