No. 17-1657
Title:Mission Product Holdings, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Tempnology, LLC, nka Old Cold LLC
Docketed:June 12, 2018
Linked with 17A1060
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-9016)
   Decision Date:January 12, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 27 2018Application (17A1060) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 12, 2018 to June 11, 2018, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 02 2018Application (17A1060) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until June 11, 2018.
Jun 11 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 12, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 28 2018Waiver of right of respondent Tempnology, LLC, n/k/a Old Cold LLC to respond filed.
Jul 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jul 09 2018Response Requested. (Due August 8, 2018)
Jul 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of The International Trademark Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 8, 2018 to September 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 7, 2018.
Aug 08 2018Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2018Brief of respondent Tempnology, LLC, n/k/a Old Cold LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2018Reply of petitioner Mission Product Holdings, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 25 2018Letter of October 23, 2018 from counsel for respondent received. (Distributed)
Main Document
Oct 26 2018Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Oct 26 2018Letter of October 25, 2018 from counsel for petitioner received. (Distributed)
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Danielle Mary Spinelli
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

danielle.spinelli@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6000
Party name: Mission Product Holdings, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Lee Harrington
    Counsel of Record
Nixon Peabody LLP
100 Summer Street
Boston, MA 02492

lharrington@nixonpeabody.com
(617)-345-1000
Party name: Tempnology, LLC, n/k/a Old Cold LLC
Other
David H. Bernstein
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise and Plimpton LLP
919 Third Ave.
New York, NY 10022

dhbernstein@debevoise.com
(212) 909-6000
Party name: The International Trademark Association
Eric F. Citron
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Law Professors