No. 17-1652
Title:Credit One Bank, N.A., Petitioner
v.
Orrin S. Anderson
Docketed:June 8, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-2496)
   Decision Date:March 7, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 05 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 9, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2018Waiver of right of respondent Orrin S. Anderson to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jul 02 2018Response Requested. (Due August 1, 2018)
Aug 01 2018Brief of respondent Orrin S. Anderson in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Aug 15 2018Reply of petitioner Credit One Bank, N.A. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: Credit One Bank, N.A.
Attorneys for Respondent
George Fortune Carpinello
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
30 South Pearl Street
Albany, NY 12207

gcarpinello@bsfllp.com
5184340600
Party name: Orrin S. Anderson