No. 17-1645
Title:Bombardier Recreational Products Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Arctic Cat Inc.
Docketed:June 7, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-1475)
   Decision Date:December 7, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:March 9, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 06 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 9, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service
Jun 08 2018Amended Proof of Service of Bombardier Recreational Products Inc., et al. submitted.
Main Document
Jun 29 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 8, 2018.
Jun 29 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 9, 2018 to August 8, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 09 2018Brief amicus curiae of Intel Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 09 2018Brief amicus curiae of High Tech Investors Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
William F. Lee
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

William.Lee@wilmerhale.com
617 526 6000
Party name: Bombardier Recreational Products Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
John Caviness O'Quinn
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 15th St. NW
Washington, DC 20005

john.oquinn@kirkland.com
202-879-5191
Party name: Arctic Cat Inc.
Other
John Thorne
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

jthorne@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: High Tech Investors Alliance
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Streeet NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: Intel Corporation