No. 17-1641
Title:Barbara Ann Thomas, et vir, Petitioners
v.
J. J. Williams
Docketed:June 6, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-20783)
   Decision Date:February 1, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 6, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 04 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 6, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word Count
Jul 05 2018Waiver of right of respondent J.J. Williams to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Aug 13 2018Response Requested. (Due September 12, 2018)
Aug 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 12, 2018 to October 12, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 12, 2018.
Oct 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 12, 2018 to November 2, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 12 2018Letter of petitioner Barbara Ann Thomas, et vir filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including October 29, 2018.
Oct 29 2018Brief of respondent J.J. Williams in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 12 2018Reply of Barbara Ann Thomas, et vir not accepted for filing. (November 13, 2018) (Corrected electronic filing submitted November 13, 2018)
Nov 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Nov 13 2018Reply of petitioners Barbara Ann Thomas, et vir filed. (Distributed)(11/13/2018)
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018.
Dec 10 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
William Pieratt Demond
    Counsel of Record
Demond & Hassan, PLLC
1520 Rutland St
Houston, TX 77008

william.demond@demondhassan.com
713-701-5240
Party name: Barbara Ann Thomas, et vir
Attorneys for Respondent
Robert William Higgason
    Counsel of Record
City of Houston Legal Department
900 Bagby, 3rd Floor
Houston, TX 77002

robert.higgason@houstontx.gov
832.393.6481
Party name: J.J. Williams