No. 17-1637
Title:John Doe, fka Jane Doe, Petitioner
v.
Eric Holcomb, Governor of Indiana, et al.
Docketed:June 4, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1756)
   Decision Date:March 2, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 31 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 5, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2018Waiver of right of respondents Eric Holcomb, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 11 2018Waiver of right of respondent Myla Eldridge to respond filed.
Jun 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jun 26 2018Response Requested. (Due July 26, 2018)
Jul 26 2018Brief of respondents Eric Holcomb, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2018Brief of respondent Myla Eldridge in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2018Reply brief of petitioner John Doe, formerly known as Jane Doe filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Aug 15 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas Andrew Saenz
    Counsel of Record
Mexican American Legal Defense and Educational Fund
634 S. Spring Street
11th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90014

tsaenz@maldef.org
2136292512
Party name: John Doe
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
3172326255
Party name: Eric Holcomb, et al.
Donald Eugene Morgan
    Counsel of Record
Office of Corporation Counsel
200 East Washington Street, Suite 1601
Indianapolis, IN 46204

donald.morgan@indy.gov
317-327-4055
Party name: Myla Eldridge