No. 17-1636
Title:California Sea Urchin Commission, et al., Petitioners
v.
Susan Combs, Acting Assistant Secretary for Fish, Wildlife, and Parks, et al.
Docketed:June 4, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-56672, 17-55428)
   Decision Date:March 1, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 30 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 5, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, California Sea Urchin Commission, et al..
Blanket Consent
Jul 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 5, 2018 to August 6, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 03 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 6, 2018
Jul 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 05 2018Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 05 2018Amicus brief of STATES OF TEXAS, ALABAMA, ARIZONA, ARKANSAS, KANSAS, LOUISIANA, MAINE, MICHIGAN, MISSOURI, MONTANA, NEBRASKA, OKLAHOMA, SOUTH CAROLINA, UTAH, WEST VIRGINIA, WISCONSIN, AND WYOMING not accepted for filing. (July 06, 2018)
Jul 05 2018Brief amici curiae of States of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 6, 2018 to September 12, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 30 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 12, 2018.
Sep 10 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 12, 2018 to September 14, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 14, 2018.
Sep 12 2018Brief of respondents Center for Biological Diversity, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 14 2018Brief of Federal Respondents in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jonathan Calvin Wood
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
3100 Clarendon Blvd., Suite 610
Arlington, VA 22201

jwood@pacificlegal.org
(202) 888-6881
Party name: California Sea Urchin Commission, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Susan Combs, et al.
Patti A. Goldman
    Counsel of Record
Earthjustice
705 Second Ave
Ste 203
Seattle, WA 98104

pgoldman@earthjustice.org
206-343-7340
Party name: Center for Biological Diversity, et al.
Other
Richard Peter Hutchison
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Legal Foundation
3100 Broadway
Suite 1210
Kansas City, MO 64111

pete.hutch@landmarklegal.org
816-931-5559
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP
1170 Peachtree Street NE
Suite 2200
Atlanta, GA 30309

jjp@sbllaw.net
703-888-8329
Party name: The Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
202-842-0200
Party name: Cato Institute, et al.