No. 17-1627 | |
Title: | Randy Lee, Warden, Petitioner v. Jason Clinard |
Docketed: | June 1, 2018 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (16-6511) |
Decision Date: | February 27, 2018 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 29 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 2, 2018) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 19 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 2, 2018 to August 1, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jun 21 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 1, 2018. |
Jul 23 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 1, 2018 to August 15, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jul 24 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 15, 2018. |
Aug 15 2018 | Brief of respondent Jason Clinard in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 29 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018. |
Aug 29 2018 | Reply of petitioner Randy Lee filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Oct 01 2018 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Sarah Keeton Campbell Counsel of Record | Special Assistant to the Solicitor General and the Attorney General P.O. Box 20207 Nashville, TN 37202-0207 Sarah.Campbell@ag.tn.gov | (615) 532-6026 |
Party name: Randy Lee | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Eric F. Citron Counsel of Record | Goldstein & Russell, P.C. 7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850 Bethesda, MD 20814 ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com | (202) 362-0636 |
Party name: Jason Clinard | ||
Michael Clark Holley | Office of the Federal Public Defender 810 Broadway Suite 200 Nashville, TN 37203 Michael_holley@fd.org | 615-736-5047 |
Party name: Jason Clinard |