No. 17-1625
Title:Rimini Street, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Oracle USA, Inc., et al.
Docketed:June 1, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-16832, 16-16905)
   Decision Date:January 8, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 2, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 31 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 2, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 2, 2018 to August 1, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 1, 2018.
Aug 01 2018Brief of respondents Oracle USA Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2018Reply of petitioners Rimini Street, Inc., and Seth Ravin filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 27 2018Petition GRANTED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
Oct 24 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Rimini Street, Inc., and Seth Ravin.
Blanket Consent
Oct 26 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Oracle USA Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Nov 13 2018Brief of petitioners Rimini Street, Inc., and Seth Ravin filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2018Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 19 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 20 2018Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Corpus Linguistics filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of Professor Patrick T. Gillen filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 28 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, January 14, 2019
Nov 30 2018CIRCULATED
Dec 06 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 11 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Dec 12 2018Record received from both the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit and the U.S.D.C. District of Nevada is electronic and located on PACER, with the exception of some SEALED and Restricted documents that are electronic.
Dec 13 2018Brief of respondents Oracle USA Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of Ralph Oman filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2018Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Linguistics filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2018Brief amici curiae of National Music Publishers' Association, and Recording Industry Association of America filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of BSA | The Software Alliance. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of Copyright Alliance filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of Professor Steven Baicker-Mckee filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 03 2019Justice Alito is no longer recused in this case.
Jan 04 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Jan 04 2019Reply of petitioners Rimini Street, Inc., and Seth Ravin filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 14 2019Argued. For petitioners: Mark A. Perry, Washington, D. C.; and Allon Kedem, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondents: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C.
Mar 04 2019Adjudged to be REVERSED IN PART and case REMANDED. Kavanaugh, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

mperry@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: Rimini Street, Inc., and Seth Ravin
Attorneys for Respondents
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Oracle USA Inc., et al.
Other
Beth Susan Brinkmann
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

bbrinkmann@cov.com
202-662-5312
Party name: National Music Publishers' Association, and Recording Industry Association of America
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Robert S. Friedman
    Counsel of Record
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
30 Rockefeller Plaza
39th Floor
New York, NY 10112

rfriedman@sheppardmullin.com
212-653-8700
Party name: Professor Steven Baicker-Mckee
Eleanor Martine Lackman
    Counsel of Record
Cowan Debaets Abrahams & Sheppard LLP
41 Madison Avenue, 38th Floor
New York, NY 10010

Elackman@cdas.com
212-974-7474
Party name: Copyright Alliance
Joshua Craig McDaniel
    Counsel of Record
Horvitz & Levy LLP
3601 W. Olive Avenue, 8th Floor
Burbank, California, CA 91505

jmcdaniel@horvitzlevy.com
8189950800
Party name: Professor Patrick T. Gillen
Stephen Michael Nickelsburg
    Counsel of Record
Clifford Chance US LLP
2001 K St NW
Washington, DC 20006

steve.nickelsburg@cliffordchance.com
202-912-5108
Party name: Scholars of Linguistics
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: BSA | The Software Alliance
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Scholars of Corpus Linguistics
Melissa Arbus Sherry
    Counsel of Record
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

melissa.sherry@lw.com
202-637-3386
Party name: Ralph Oman
Stefan Michael Mentzer
    Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020-1095

smentzer@whitecase.com
212-819-8705
Party name: American Intellectual Property Law Association