No. 17-1624
Title:Citizen Potawatomi Nation, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:June 1, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-6224)
   Decision Date:February 6, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 6, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 30 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 2, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Aug 10 2018Response Requested. (Due September 10, 2018)
Sep 10 2018Brief of respondent State of Oklahoma in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory Mark Quinlan
    Counsel of Record
1601 S. Gordon Cooper Dr.
Shawnee, OK 74801

gquinlan@potawatomi.org
4052753121
Party name: Citizen Potawatomi Nation
Attorneys for Respondent
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: State of Oklahoma
Larry D. OttawayFoliart, Huff, Ottaway & Bottom
201 Robert S. Kerr Avenue
Bank of Oklahoma Plaza, 12th Floor
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

larryottaway@oklahomacounsel.com
(405)-232-4633
Party name: State of Oklahoma