No. 17-1618
Vide 17-1623
Title:Gerald Lynn Bostock, Petitioner
v.
Clayton County, Georgia
Docketed:June 1, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-13801)
   Decision Date:May 10, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 25 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 2, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Gerald Lynn Bostock.
Blanket Consent
Jun 27 2018Waiver of right of respondent Clayton County, Georgia to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jul 13 2018Response Requested. (Due August 13, 2018)
Aug 02 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Gerald Lynn Bostock filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 10 2018Brief of respondent Clayton County, Georgia in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 24 2018Reply of petitioner Gerald Lynn Bostock filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 11 2018Rescheduled.
Nov 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Nov 26 2018Rescheduled.
Dec 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018.
Dec 03 2018Rescheduled.
Dec 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019.
Mar 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Mar 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2019.
Mar 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2019.
Apr 08 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Apr 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/18/2019.
Apr 22 2019Petition GRANTED. The petition for writ of certiorari in No. 17-1623 is granted. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Apr 23 2019Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 17-1618. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 17-1618. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the fling is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
May 09 2019Briefing proposal from the parties in Nos. 17-1618, 17-1623, and 18-107 filed. VIDED.
Main Document
May 13 2019Petitioner in No. 17-1618, respondents in No. 17-1623, and respondent Aimee Stephens in No. 18-107 shall file their briefs on the merits, pursuant to Rule 33.1(g)(v), on or before Wednesday, June 26, 2019. Respondent in No. 17-1618, petitioners in No. 17-1623, and petitioner and respondent EEOC in No. 18-107 shall file their briefs on the merits, pursuant to Rule 33.1(g)(vi), on or before Friday, August 16, 2019. Reply briefs, if any, pursuant to Rule 33.1(g)(vii), shall be filed on or before Monday, September 16, 2019. Amicus curiae briefs shall be filed pursuant to Rule 37.3. VIDED.
May 22 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Altitude Express, Inc., et al. (petitioners in 17-1623)
Blanket Consent
Jun 05 2019Letter from counsel for petitioner, respondents in 17-1623, and respondent Aimee Stephens in 18-107, regarding requests for consent to file amicus curiae briefs filed. VIDED.
Main Document
Jun 12 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Clayton County, Georgia.
Blanket Consent
Jun 26 2019Joint appendix filed (in 17-1618). (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 26 2019Brief of petitioner Gerald Lynn Bostock filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 26 2019Joint appendix filed (in 17-1623). (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 26 2019Brief of respondents Melissa Zarda, et al. filed (in 17-1623).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 27 2019Brief amicus curiae of Karl Olson filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 01 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, October 8, 2019. VIDED
Jul 02 2019Brief amici curiae of The Women’s and Children’s Advocacy Project, Equal Means Equal, and Allies Reaching for Equality filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Employment Discrimination Law Scholars filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of Altria Group, Inc. filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of William N. Eskridge Jr. and Andrew M. Koppelman filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Anti-Discrimination Scholars filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Letter to the Clerk Joining Another Amicus Brief of Intel Corporation not accepted for filing. (July 05, 2019)
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of The Southern Poverty Law Center, et al. filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of Legal Aid Society filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Statutory Interpretation and Equality Law Scholars filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of 206 Businesses filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Modern Military Association of America and Transgender American Veterans Association filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of States of Illinois, New York, et al. filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Philosophy Professors filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Historians filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107).
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of National Education Association, et al. filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of InterACT: Advocates for Intersex Youth, et al. filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of The Trevor Project, PFLAG, and Family Equality filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Business Organizations filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of The American Medical Association, et al. filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Muslim Bar Association of New York, et al. filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Scholars Who Study the LGB Population filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Local Governments and Mayors filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of National LGBT Bar Association, et al. filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Kenneth B. Mehlman et al. filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Corpus-Linguistics Scholars Professors Brian Slocum, et al. filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of The Presiding Bishop and President of the House of Deputies of the Episcopal Church, et al. filed. VIDED (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Former Executive Branch Officials and Leaders, et al. filed. VIDED. (also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Georgia Equality filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountOtherProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Service Employees International Union, et al. filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Women CEOs and Other C-Suite Executives filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Walter Dellinger, et al. filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Amicus brief of GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, National Center for Lesbian Rights, et al. not accepted for filing. (Corrected version submitted).
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, National Center for Lesbian Rights, et al. filed (July 10, 2019). VIDED. (Also in 18-107).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Wisconsin Advcocacy Organizations filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of American Psychological Association, et al. filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender, and Queer (LGBTQ+) Members of the Legal Profession and Law Students filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of National Women's Law Center filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Impact Fund, et al. filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, the Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights, and 57 Civil Rights Organizations filed. VIDED. (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2019Statement of Printing Cost of Melissa Zarda et al. (respondents in 17-1623) not accepted for filing. (July 12, 2019). (Document not of the type to be filed electronically)
Jul 26 2019Joint motion of petitioner Bostock and respondents Zarda and Moore for divided argument filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 01 2019CIRCULATED
Aug 16 2019Brief of petitioners Altitude Express, Inc., et al. filed (in 17-1623). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed. VIDED. (Distributed). (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2019Brief of respondent Clayton County, Georgia filed (in 17-1618). (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 16 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit.
Aug 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of Marriage Law Foundation filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of The H.T. Hackney Co. filed. VIDED. (Distributed) (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of First Liberty Institute filed. VIDED. (Distributed) (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2019Brief amicus curiae of Advocates for Faith and Freedom filed. VIDED. (Distributed) (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2019Brief amicus curiae of David A. Robinson filed. VIDED. (Distributed) (Also in 18-107)
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 21 2019Amicus brief of David A. Robinson not accepted for filing. (Duplicate submission)(August 26, 2019)
Aug 21 2019Brief amici curiae of Defend My Privacy, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed) (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2019Amicus brief of National Association of Evangelicals, et al. not accepted for filing. (August 23, 2019)
Aug 22 2019Brief amici curiae of National Organization for Marriage and Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed. VIDED. (Distributed) (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2019Brief amici curiae of National Association of Evangelicals, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed) (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Aug 22 2019Brief amici curiae of Institute for Faith and Family and Christian Family Coalition filed. VIDED. (Distributed) (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2019Brief amici curiae of Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed) (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed. VIDED. (Distributed) (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Public Philosophy Institute filed. VIDED. (Distributed) (Also in 18-107)
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 23 2019Brief amicus curiae of Ryan T. Anderson filed. VIDED (Distributed) (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2019Brief amici curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 23 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 23 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 23 2019Brief amici curiae of Council of Christian Colleges & Universities, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed) (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2019Brief amici curiae of Religious Freedom Institute's Islam & Religious Freedom Action Team and Islamic Scholars filed. VIDED. (Distributed) (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2019Brief amici curiae of States of Tennessee, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed) (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2019Brief amici curiae of Public Advocate of the United States, et al. filed. VIDED.(Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2019Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed. VIDED. (Distributed) (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2019Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Counsel filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2019Brief amici curiae of Business Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed) (Also in 18-107)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2019Brief amicus curiae of W. Burlette Carter filed (in 17-1623). (Distributed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Aug 23 2019Amicus brief of Muslim American Leaders not accepted for filing. (October 01, 2019)
Aug 27 2019Record from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit is complete and located on PACER.
Sep 10 2019Reply of respondent Melissa Zarda, et al. (respondents in 17-1623) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2019Reply of petitioner Gerald Lynn Bostock filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2019Motion for divided argument filed by petitioners DENIED. VIDED.
Sep 11 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. VIDED.
Oct 07 2019Amicus brief of Muslim American Leaders submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 08 2019Argued. For petitioner in 17-1618 and respondents in 17-1623: Pamela S. Karlan, Stanford, Cal. For respondent in 17-1618 and petitioners in 17-1623: Jeffrey M. Harris, Arlington, Va.; and Noel J. Francisco, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian John Sutherland
    Counsel of Record
Buckley Beal, LLP
600 Peachtree Street NE
Suite 3900
Atlanta, GA 30308

bsutherland@buckleybeal.com
(404) 781-1100
Party name: Gerald Lynn Bostock
Saul D. Zabell
    Counsel of Record
Zabell & Associates, P.C.
1 Corporate Drive
Suite 103
Bohemia, NY 11716

szabell@laborlawsny.com
631-589-7242
Party name: Altitude Express, Inc., et al. (petitioners in 17-1623)
Attorneys for Respondent
Gregory Antollino
    Counsel of Record
Suite 904
588 Broadway
New York, NY 10012

gregory10011@icloud.com
212-334-7397
Party name: Melissa Zarda, et al. (respondents in 17-1623)
Jack R. Hancock
    Counsel of Record
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
661 Forest Parkway
Suite E
Forest Park, GA 30297

jhancock@fmglaw.com
470-322-1802
Party name: Clayton County, Georgia
Jeffrey Matthew HarrisConsovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

jeff@consovoymccarthy.com
202-321-4120
Party name: Clayton County, Georgia
Pamela Susan KarlanStanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

karlan@stanford.edu
650-725-4851
Party name: Melissa Zarda et al. (respondents in 17-1623)
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6023
Party name: American Psychological Association, et al.
Todd Steven Anten
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10010

toddanten@quinnemanuel.com
(212) 849-7000
Party name: 206 Businesses
Dan L. Bagatell
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
3 Weatherby Road
Hanover, NH 03755

dbagatell@perkinscoie.com
6023518250
Party name: Intel Corporation
Peter T. Barbur
    Counsel of Record
Cravath, Swaine & Moore
825 Eighth Avenue
New York, NY 10019

pbarbur@cravath.com
(212) 474-1000
Party name: Members of Congress
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-679-5257
Party name: Business Organizations
Andree Kahn Blumstein
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 20207
Nashville, TN 20207

andree.blumstein@ag.tn.gov
615-741-3492
Party name: States of Tennessee, Nebraska, Texas, et al.
Emmet J Bondurant II
    Counsel of Record
Bondurant, Mixson & Elmore, LLP
3900 One Atlantic Center
1201 W. Peachtree Street
Atlanta, GA 30309

bondurant@bmelaw.com
404-421-0837
Party name: Georgia Equality
Janine Marilyn Brookner
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Janine M. Brookner
3645 Saint Mary's Pl., NW
Washington, DC 20007

jmbrookner@gmail.com
2023380851
Party name: Karl Olson
Brian Timothy Burgess
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
901 New York Avenue
Washington, DC 20001

BBurgess@goodwinlaw.com
2023464000
Party name: Legal Aid Society
Robert M. Carlson
    Counsel of Record
American Bar Association
321 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

abapresident@americanbar.org
312-988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association
Willieta Burlette Carter
    Counsel of Record
W. Burlette Carter, Professor Emerita, c/o George Washington Univ. Law Sch
1911 Locust Grove Rd
2000 H St, NW, DC 20052

bcarter@law.gwu.edu
2029945155
Party name: W. Burlette Carter
Barbara Jane Chisholm
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler Berzon LLP
177 Post Street, Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

bchisholm@altber.com
4154217151
Party name: Service Employees International Union, et al.
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste.430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3883
Party name: Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et al.
Margaret A. Costello
    Counsel of Record
University of Detroit Mercy School of Law
651 East Jefferson Avenue
Detroit, MI 48226-4386

costelma@udmercy.edu
3135969854
Party name: Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender, and Queer (LGBTQ+) Members of the Legal Profession and Law Students
Andrew Rhys Davies
    Counsel of Record
Allen and Overy LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

andrewrhys.davies@allenovery.com
212 610 6300
Party name: Corpus-Linguistics Scholars Professors Brian Slocum, et al.
Deborah Dewart
    Counsel of Record
620 E. Sabiston Drive
Swansboro, NC 28584

debcpalaw@earthlink.net
9103264554
Party name: Institute for Faith and Family and Christian Family Coalition
Douglas Charles Dreier
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
1776 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

ddreier@wileyrein.com
2027194988
Party name: The Trevor Project, PFLAG, and Family Equality
William C. Duncan
    Counsel of Record
Marriage Law Foundation
1868 N 800 E
Lehi, UT 84043

billduncan56@gmail.com
(801)-367-4570
Party name: Marriage Law Foundation
Alexander Dushku
    Counsel of Record
Kirton McConkie
36 South State St.
Suite 1900
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

adushku@kmclaw.com
801-328-3600
Party name: National Association of Evangelicals, et al.
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

jeastman@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: National Organization for Marriage and Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
3343241812
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Roy T. Englert Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, et al.
2000 K Street, N.W
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

renglert@robbinsrussell.com
2027754503
Party name: Kenneth B. Mehlman et al.
William N. Eskridge Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Yale Law School
127 Wall Street
New Haven, CT 06511

william.eskridge@yale.edu
(203) 432-4992
Party name: William N. Eskridge Jr. and Andrew M. Koppelman
Matthew James Ginsburg
    Counsel of Record
American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations
815 16th St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

mginsburg@aflcio.org
202-637-5397
Party name: American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations
Suzanne Beth Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Columbia Law School Sexuality and Gender Law Clinic
435 West 116th Street
New York, NY 10027

sgoldberg@columbia.edu
212-854-0411
Party name: Women CEOs and Other C-Suite Executives
Lauren Rosenblum Goldman
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

lgoldman@mayerbrown.com
(212) 506-2500
Party name: Altria Group, Inc.
Danielle Luce Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney
200 N. Main Street, 7th Fl.
Los Angeles, CA 90012

danielle.goldstein@lacity.org
213.978.8100
Party name: Local Governments and Mayors
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Statutory Interpretation and Equality Law Scholars
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
(202) 736-8291
Party name: Scholars Who Study the LGB Population
Richard Shawn Gunnarson
    Counsel of Record
Kirton McConkie
Key Bank Tower
36 South State Street, Suite 1900
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

sgunnarson@kmclaw.com
801-323-5907
Party name: Council of Christian Colleges & Universities, et al.
Lisa Hogan
    Counsel of Record
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP
410 17th St. Suite 2200
Denver, CO 80202

lhogan@bhfs.com
303-223-1100
Party name: Philosophy Professors
Talib Ibn Karim
    Counsel of Record
TEC Law Firm
1629 K Street, NW
Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006

tkarim@teclawfirm.com
2022560499
Party name: Muslim American Leaders
Jonah Moses Knobler
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

jknobler@pbwt.com
2123362134
Party name: Interact: Advocates for Intersex Youth, et al.
Erica Courtney Lai
    Counsel of Record
Cohen & Gresser LLP
2001 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006

elai@cohengresser.com
2028512073
Party name: National Women's Law Center
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
Mololamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 660
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
2025562010
Party name: National Education Association, American Federation of Teachers, National School Board Association, and AASA, the School Superintendents Association
C. Thomas Ludden
    Counsel of Record
Lipson Neilson P.C.
3910 Telegraph Road, Suite 200
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48302

tludden@lipsonneilson.com
248-593-5000
Party name: Advocates for Faith and Freedom
Adeel Abdullah Mangi
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

aamangi@pbwt.com
(212) 36-2000
Party name: Muslim Bar Association of New York, et al.
Joshua Adam Matz
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
350 Fifth Avenue
Suite 7110
New York, NY 10118

jmatz@kaplanhecker.com
(212) 763-0883
Party name: Walter Dellinger, et al.
Jeffrey Allen McIntyre
    Counsel of Record
HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP
33 East Main Street
Suite 300
Madison, WI 53703

jeffrey.mcintyre@huschblackwell.com
608-255-4440
Party name: Wisconsin Advcocacy Organizations
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
James Leon Moore III
    Counsel of Record
1440 New York Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20005

james.moore@probonolaw.com
202-371-7337
Party name: Modern Military Association of America and Transgender American Veterans Association
Wendy J. Murphy
    Counsel of Record
New England School of Law | Boston
154 Stuart Street
Boston, MA 02116

Wmurphy@nesl.edu
(617) 422-7410
Party name: The Women’s and Children’s Advocacy Project, Equal Means Equal, and Allies Reaching for Equality
Lindsay Polastri Nako
    Counsel of Record
Impact Fund
125 University Ave., Suite 102
Berkeley, CA 94710-1616

lnako@impactfund.org
5108453473
Party name: Impact Fund, et al.
Gregory R. Nevins
    Counsel of Record
Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.
730 Peachtree Street NE
Suite 640
Atlanta, GA 30308

gnevins@lambdalegal.org
4048971880
Party name: Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Public Advocate of the United States, et al.
Anthony Richard Picarello Jr.
    Counsel of Record
United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, Office of General Counsel
3211 4th Street, NE
Washignton, DC 20017

apicarello@usccb.org
202-541-3311
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al.
Joel Aaron Ready
    Counsel of Record
Cornerstone Law Firm, LLC
8500 Allentown Pike, Suite 3
Blandon, PA 19510

info@cornerstonelaw.us
6109267875
Party name: Defend My Privacy, et al.
Mitchell Pearsall Reich
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St. NW
Washington, DC 20004

mitchell.reich@hoganlovells.com
2026375833
Party name: Anti-Discrimination Scholars
David Alan Robinson
    Counsel of Record
David A. Robinson. Attomey at Law
P.O. Box 780
North Haven, CT 06473

davidr225@comcast.net
2032144078
Party name: David A. Robinson
Sanford Jay Rosen
    Counsel of Record
Rosen Bien Galvan & Grunfeld LLP
101 Mission Street, Sixth Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105

srosen@rbgg.com
415-433-6830
Party name: National LGBT Bar Association, et al.
Daniel Adam Rubens
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

drubens@orrick.com
2125063679
Party name: Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, the Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights, and 57 Civil Rights Organizations
Sasha Minh Samberg-Champion
    Counsel of Record
Relman, Dane & Colfax
1225 19th St., NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20036-2456

ssamberg-champion@relmanlaw.com
2027281888
Party name: Employment Discrimination Law Scholars
Alan Evan Schoenfeld
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale and Dorr, LLP
7 World Trade Center, 250 World Trade Center
New York, NY 10007

alan.schoenfeld@wilmerhale.com
(212)-937-7294
Party name: GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, National Center for Lesbian Rights, et al.
Chanakya Arjun Sethi
    Counsel of Record
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz LLP
130 W 42nd St
Suite 1402
New York, NY 10036

csethi@wilkinsonwalsh.com
929-264-7758
Party name: Historians
Kelly J. Shackelford
    Counsel of Record
First Liberty Institute
First Liberty Institute, 2001 W Piano Pkwy
Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kshackelford@firstliberty.org
972-941-4444
Party name: First Liberty Institute
Melissa Arbus Sherry
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

melissa.sherry@lw.com
202-637-3386
Party name: The Southern Poverty Law Center, et al.
Mathew D. Staver
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 540774
Orlando, FL 32854

mat@lc.org
407-875-1776
Party name: Liberty Counsel
Jeffrey S. Trachtman
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

jtrachtman@kramerlevin.com
212 715 9175
Party name: The Presiding Bishop and President of the House of Deputies of the Episcopal Church, et al.
Edward Howard Trent
    Counsel of Record
Wimberly Lawson Wright Daves & Jones PLLC
550 Main Avenue, Suite 900
P.O. Box 2231
Knoxville, TN 37922

etrent@wimberlylawson.com
(865) 546-1000
Party name: The H.T. Hackney Co.
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: States of Illinois, New York, et al.
David Robert Upham
    Counsel of Record
University of Dallas
1845 E. Northgate Drive
Irving, TX 75062

davidrupham@yahoo.com
972-721-5186
Party name: American Public Philosophy Institute
Michael K. Whitehead
    Counsel of Record
Whitehead Law Firm, LLC
229 SE Douglas Street
Suite 210
Lee's Summit, MO 64063

mike@thewhiteheadfirm.com
816-398-8967
Party name: Religious Freedom Institute's Islam & Religious Freedom Action Team and Islamic Scholars
Scott Block Wilkens
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
1776 K Street NW
Suite 1200 South
Washington, DC 20006

swilkens@wileyrein.com
(202) 719-7000
Party name: The American Medical Association, et al.
Evan Wolfson
    Counsel of Record
Dentons US LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

evan@freedomtomarry.org
212-768-6700
Party name: Former Executive Branch Officials and Leaders, et al.