No. 17-1616
Title:Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Merus N.V.
Docketed:June 1, 2018
Linked with 17A945
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1346)
   Decision Date:July 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:December 26, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 07 2018Application (17A945) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 26, 2018 to May 25, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 08 2018Application (17A945) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until May 25, 2018.
May 25 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 2, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2018Waiver of right of respondent Merus N.V. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 08 2018Response Requested. (Due July 9, 2018)
Jun 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 9, 2018 to August 8, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 8, 2018.
Jun 29 2018Brief amicus curiae of New York Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither Party Filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 09 2018Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 09 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Patent Practitioners in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 09 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Seven Chicago Patent Lawyers.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 09 2018Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
John Caviness O'Quinn
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 15th St. NW
Washington, DC 20005

john.oquinn@kirkland.com
202-879-5191
Party name: Merus N.V.
Other
David L. Applegate
    Counsel of Record
Williams Montgomery & John Ltd.
6800 Willis Tower
233 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

dla@willmont.com
312-443-3200
Party name: Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago
Kevin Edward Noonan
    Counsel of Record
McDonnell Boehnen Hulbert & Berghoff LLP
300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 3100
Chicago, IL 60606

noonan@mbhb.com
312-913-0001
Party name: Seven Chicago Patent Lawyers
Constance F. Ramos
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Constance F. Ramos, PhD
1999 Harrison Street
Suite 1800
Oakland, CA 94612

constance@akira-ip.com
510-473-8876
Party name: National Association of Patent Practitioners
Irena Royzman
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

iroyzman@pbwt.com
(212) 336-2000
Party name: NEW YORK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LAW ASSOCIATION
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-0000

rsamp@wlf.org
202-588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation