No. 17-1607
Title:Kenneth E. Fairley, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 29, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-60001)
   Decision Date:January 22, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:February 26, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 24 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 28, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 28, 2018 to July 30, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 30, 2018.
Jun 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of Professors of Evidence filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 30, 2018 to August 29, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 29, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Herbert V. Larson Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Law Offices of Herbert V. Larson, Jr.
700 Camp Street
New Orleans, LA 70130-0000

hvl@hvllaw.com
504-528-9500
Party name: Kenneth Fairley
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Ben Lev Winslade Trachtenberg
    Counsel of Record
University of Missouri School of Law
203 Hulston Hall
Columbia, MO 65211

trachtenbergb@missouri.edu
5738827293
Party name: Professors of Evidence