No. 17-1603 *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |
Title: | William Harold Kelley, Petitioner v. Florida |
Docketed: | May 29, 2018 |
Linked with 17A1091 | |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Florida |
Case Numbers: | (SC17-830) |
Decision Date: | January 26, 2018 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 09 2018 | Application (17A1091) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 26, 2018 to June 25, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Apr 12 2018 | Application (17A1091) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 25, 2018. |
May 25 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 28, 2018) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 22 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 28, 2018 to July 30, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jun 26 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 30, 2018. |
Jul 30 2018 | Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 09 2018 | Reply of petitioner William Harold Kelley filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 15 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018. |
Oct 01 2018 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Sylvia H Walbolt Counsel of Record | Carlton Fields, P.A. 4221 West Boy Scout Road Suite 1000 Tampa, FL 33607 swalbolt@carltonfields.com | 8132294255 |
Party name: William Harold Kelley | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Amitabh Agarwal Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General The Capitol PL-01 Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050 amit.agarwal@myfloridalegal.com | 850-414-3688 |
Party name: State of Florida |