No. 17-1584
Title:Daniel J. H. Bartelt, Petitioner
v.
Wisconsin
Docketed:May 23, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Wisconsin
   Case Numbers:(2015AP2506-CR)
   Decision Date:February 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 17 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 22, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 30 2018Waiver of right of respondent Wisconsin to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 11 2018Response Requested. (Due July 11, 2018)
Jun 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 11, 2018 to August 10, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 10, 2018.
Jul 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Colleen D. Ball
    Counsel of Record
Office of the State Public Defender
735 N. Water St., Ste. 912
Milwaukee, WI 53202

ballc@opd.wi.gov
414-227-3110
Party name: Daniel J.H. Bartelt
Attorneys for Respondent
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Dept. of Justice
17 W. Main Street
P.O. Box 7857
Madison, WI 53707-7857

tseytlinm@doj.state.wi.us
(608) 267-9323
Party name: Wisconsin
Other
Rex S. Heinke
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
1999 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 600
Los Angeles, CA 90067

rheinke@akingump.com
310-229-1000
Party name: The Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center