No. 17-1572
Title:Lucas Peterson, et al., Petitioners
v.
Walter Franklin, II, Trustee for the Estate of Terrance Terrell Franklin
Docketed:May 21, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4429)
   Decision Date:December 26, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:February 16, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 17 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 20, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jul 19 2018Response Requested. (Due August 20, 2018)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Brian Scott Carter
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Minneapolis City Attorney
350 South Fifth St., Room 210
Minneapolis, MN 55414

brian.carter@minneapolismn.gov
612-673-2063
Party name: Lucas Peterson, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael Padden
    Counsel of Record
Padden Law Firm
8673 Eagle Point Blvd.
Lake Elmo, MT 55042

mike.padden@paddenlaw.com
651-789-6545
Party name: Walter Franklin
Other
Timothy Towery Coates
    Counsel of Record
Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP
5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90036

tcoates@gmsr.com
(310) 859-7811
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association