No. 17-1568
Title:Raul Padilla-Ramirez, Petitioner
v.
Robert M. Culley, et al.
Docketed:May 18, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-35385)
   Decision Date:February 15, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 16 2018Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
May 16 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 18, 2018)
Jun 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 18, 2018 to July 18, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Jun 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 18, 2018.
Jun 18 2018Brief amici curiae of Nonprofit Legal Services Organizations and Co-Director of Law School Immigration Clinic filed.
Jul 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 18, 2018 to August 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew Hyrum Adams
    Counsel of Record
Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
615 Second Avenue
Suite 400
Seattle, WA 98104

matt@nwirp.org
(206)-957-8611
Party name: Raul Padilla-Ramirez
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Robert M. Culley, et al.
Other
Jeffrey Michael Gutkin
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
101 California Street, 5th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111-5800

jgutkin@cooley.com
415 693 2026
Party name: Nonprofit Legal Services Organizations and Co-Director of Law School Immigration Clinic