No. 17-1566
Title:Rogers Lacaze, Petitioner
v.
Louisiana
Docketed:May 18, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Louisiana
   Case Numbers:(2016-KP-0234)
   Decision Date:March 13, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 17 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 18, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 30 2018Waiver of right of respondent Louisiana to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 04 2018Brief amici curiae of Louisiana Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Ethics Bureau at Yale filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 11 2018Response Requested. (Due July 11, 2018)
Jun 18 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Jury Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of Professor Jed Handelsman Shugerman filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 25 2018Brief amici curiae of Former State and Federal Trial Court Judges filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 11, 2018 to August 10, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 29 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 10, 2018.
Aug 10 2018Brief of respondent Louisiana in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amir H. Ali
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
718 7th St. NW
Washington, DC 20001

amir.ali@macarthurjustice.org
202-869-3434
Party name: Rogers Lacaze
Attorneys for Respondent
Christopher James Ponoroff
    Counsel of Record
Orleans Parish District Attorney's Office
619 S. White St.
New Orleans, LA 70119

cponoroff@orleansda.com
504-822-2414
Party name: Louisiana
Other
Lawrence J. Fox
    Counsel of Record
Visiting Lecturer in Law Yale Law School
127 Wall Street
New Haven, CT 06511

lawrence.fox@yale.edu
(203) 432-9358
Party name: The Ethics Bureau at Yale
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
Mololamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 660
660 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
202-556-2000
Party name: National Jury Project
Dawn Elise Murphy-Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Miller & Chevaler Chartered
900 Sixteenth St. NW
Washington, DC 20006

dmurphyjohnson@milchev.com
202-626-5800
Party name: Former State and Federal Trial Court Judges
Susannah P. Torpey
    Counsel of Record
WINSTON & STRAWN LLP
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166

storpey@winston.com
212.294.6700
Party name: Professor Jed Handelsman Shugerman
Pieter H. B. Van Tol
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
875 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022

pieter.vantol@hoganlovells.com
212-909-0661
Party name: Louisiana Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al.