No. 17-1559
Title:Leonardo Villegas-Sarabia, Petitioner
v.
Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General
Docketed:May 17, 2018
Linked with 17A942
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-60639)
   Decision Date:October 31, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:December 15, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 01 2018Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filing in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Mar 01 2018Application (17A942) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 15, 2018 to May 14, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Mar 07 2018Application (17A942) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until May 14, 2018.
May 14 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 18, 2018)
Jun 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 18, 2018 to July 18, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Jun 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 18, 2018.
Jul 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 18, 2018 to August 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Jul 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 17, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lance Edward Curtright
    Counsel of Record
De Mott, McChesney, Curtright, Armendariz, LLP
800 Dolorosa, Ste. 100
San Antonio, TX 78207

lance@dmcausa.com
(210) 354-1844
Party name: Leonardo Villegas-Sarabia
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General