No. 17-155
Title:Erik Lindsey Hughes, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 1, 2017
Linked with 16A1134
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-15246)
   Decision Date:February 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 19 2017Application (16A1134) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 28, 2017 to July 27, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
May 22 2017Application (16A1134) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until July 27, 2017.
Jul 27 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 31, 2017)
Aug 24 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 2, 2017.
Sep 22 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 1, 2017.
Nov 01 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Nov 17 2017Reply of petitioner Erik Hughes filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017.
Dec 08 2017Petition GRANTED.
Jan 11 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Erik Hughes.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 22 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Jan 22 2018Brief of petitioner Erik Hughes filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, March 27, 2018
Jan 25 2018Brief amici curiae of Chantell and Michael Sackett, and Duarte Nursery, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of Richard M. Re in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Law Professors in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2018Brief amici curiae of Agricultural Building, Forestry, Livestock, Manufacturing, Mining, and Petroleum Business Interests filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2018Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and the National Association of Federal Defenders filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2018Brief amicus curiae of Professor Douglas A. Berman filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2018CIRCULATED
Feb 20 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Law Professors in support of neither party GRANTED.
Feb 21 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit.
Feb 21 2018Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Mar 02 2018Record received from the U.S.D.C. Northern Dist. of Georgia. (1 Envelope, part of the record is Sealed)
Mar 13 2018Reply of petitioner Erik Hughes filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2018Argued. For petitioner: Eric Shumsky, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Rachel P. Kovner, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.
Jun 04 2018Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Kennedy, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Ginsburg, Breyer, Sotomayor, Kagan, and Gorsuch, JJ., joined. Sotomayor, J., filed a concurring opinion. Roberts, C. J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Thomas and Alito, JJ., joined.
Jul 06 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
(212)-506-5000
Party name: Erik Hughes
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Jean-Claude Andre
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
555 W. Fifth Street
Los Angeles, CA 90013

jcandre@sidley.com
213-896-6007
Party name: Professor Douglas A. Berman
Timothy S. Bishop
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
71 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

tbishop@mayerbrown.com
3127017829
Party name: Agricultural Building, Forestry, Livestock, Manufacturing, Mining, and Petroleum Business Interests
Nathaniel Peardon Garrett
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
555 California Street, 26th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104

ngarrett@jonesday.com
4158755731
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and the National Association of Federal Defenders
Brian Trevor Hodges
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento , CA 95814

bth@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Chantell and Michael Sackett and Duarte Nursery, Inc.
Richard Macdonald Re
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law
405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90095

re@law.ucla.edu
310-825-7159
Party name: Richard M. Re
Maxwell Leon Stearns
    Counsel of Record
University of Maryland Carey School of Law
500 W. Baltimore St.
Baltimore, MD 21201

mstearns@law.umaryland.edu
4102182804
Party name: Law Professors