No. 17-1543
Title:Brenda Olivar, et al., Petitioners
v.
Public Service Employee Credit Union Long Term Disability Plan, et al.
Docketed:May 15, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Colorado
   Case Numbers:(15SC801, 16SC163)
   Decision Date:February 12, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 11 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 14, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 06 2018Waiver of right of respondents Public Service Employee Credit Union Long Term Disability Plan, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jun 25 2018Response Requested. (Due July 25, 2018)
Jul 25 2018Brief of respondents Public Service Employee Credit Union Long Term Disability Plan, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Brian Alan Murphy
    Counsel of Record
The Murphy Law Firm, LLC
10200 W. 44th Ave. Suite 340
Wheat Ridge, CO 80033

brian@brianmurphy.net
3038479247
Party name: Brenda Olivar, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael Stuart Beaver
    Counsel of Record
Holland & Hart
6380 S. Fiddler's Green Cir.
Suite 500
Greenwood Village, CO 80111

mbeaver@hollandhart.com
303-290-1631
Party name: Public Service Employee Credit Union Long Term Disability Plan, et al.