No. 17-1542
Title:Kathrine Mae McKee, Petitioner
v.
William H. Cosby, Jr.
Docketed:May 14, 2018
Linked with 17A971
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1256)
   Decision Date:October 18, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:December 20, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 07 2018Application (17A971) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 20, 2018 to April 19, 2018, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 14 2018Application (17A971) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until April 19, 2018.
Apr 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 13, 2018)
PetitionAppendixAppendixAppendix
Jun 11 2018Waiver of right of respondent William H. Cosby, Jr. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jun 29 2018Response Requested. (Due July 30, 2018)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Frederick William Salo
    Counsel of Record
F. William Salo, Esq.
501 East 87th Street, No. 11-F
New York, NY 10128

billsalo@salolaw.com
212-517-3050
Party name: Kathrine Mae McKee
Attorneys for Respondent
Sarah Elisabeth Kelly-Kilgore
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Gross LLP
601 S Figueroa Street
30th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90017

skellykilgore@ggtriallaw.com
2133347065
Party name: William H. Cosby, Jr.