No. 17-1534
Vide 17-1529, 17-1530
Title:Bank Markazi, aka The Central Bank of Iran, Petitioner
v.
Deborah Peterson, et al.
Docketed:May 10, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-0690)
   Decision Date:November 21, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:February 7, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 07 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 11, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 11, 2018 to July 11, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 11, 2018.
Jul 11 2018Brief of respondents Deborah Peterson, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2018Reply of petitioner Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
Mololamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 660
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
2025562010
Party name: Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew Dempsey McGill
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

mmcgill@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3680
Party name: Deborah Peterson, et al.
Liviu VogelSalon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLP
292 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10017

lvogel@salonmarrow.com
2126617100
Party name: Deborah Peterson, et al.