No. 17-1516
Title:George Evans, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 8, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-2423)
   Decision Date:December 4, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:February 6, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 04 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 7, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 07 2018Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian J. O'Connell
    Counsel of Record
Strauss Troy Co. L.P.A.
150 East Fourth Street
4th Floor
Cincinnati, OH 45202

bjoconnell@strausstroy.com
5136212120
Party name: George Evans
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States