No. 17-1511
Title:Larry W. Newton, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Indiana
Docketed:May 7, 2018
Linked with 17A952
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Indiana, Fifth District
   Case Numbers:(18A05-1612-PC-2817)
   Decision Date:September 6, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:December 19, 2017

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 05 2018Application (17A952) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 19, 2018 to May 3, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherOtherProof of Service
Mar 08 2018Application (17A952) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until May 3, 2018.
May 03 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 6, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2018Brief amici curiae of Juvenile Law Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2018Brief amicus curiae of Indiana Public Defender Council Juvenile Defense Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 6, 2018 to August 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 6, 2018.
Aug 03 2018Brief of respondent State of Indiana in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2018Reply of petitioner Larry W. Newton filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 11 2018Rescheduled.
Nov 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Nov 29 2018Rescheduled.
Dec 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018.
Dec 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019.
Mar 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Robert Mills
    Counsel of Record
Phillips Black
836 Harrison Street
San Francisco, CA 94107

j.mills@phillipsblack.org
888-532-0897
Party name: Larry W. Newton
Attorneys for Respondent
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: State of Indiana
Stephen Richard CreasonOffice of the Indiana Attorney General
302 West Washington St., 5th Floor
Indianapolis, IN 46204

steve.creason@atg.in.gov
317-232-6201
Party name: State of Indiana
Other
Marsha Levick
    Counsel of Record
Juvenile Law Center
1315 Walnut Street, 4th Fl.
Philadelphia, PA 19107

mlevick@jlc.org
215-625-0551
Party name: Juvenile Law Center, et al.
Cara Schaefer Wieneke
    Counsel of Record
Wieneke Law Office, LLC
P.O. Box 368
Brooklyn, IN 46111

cara@wienekelaw.com
3173318293
Party name: Indiana Public Defender Council Juvenile Defense Project