No. 17-1484
Title:Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary of Health and Human Services, Petitioner
v.
Allina Health Services, et al.
Docketed:April 30, 2018
Linked with 17A880
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-5255)
   Decision Date:July 25, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:November 29, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 16 2018Application (17A880) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 27, 2018 to March 29, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 21 2018Application (17A880) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 29, 2018.
Mar 19 2018Application (17A880) to extend further the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 29, 2018 to April 27, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written RequestProof of Service
Mar 22 2018Application (17A880) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 27, 2018.
Apr 27 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 30, 2018)
Proof of ServicePetitionProof of ServiceAppendix
May 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 30, 2018 to June 29, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 29, 2018.
Jun 19 2018Brief of respondents Allina Health Services, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Alex M. Azar II, Secretary of Health and Human Services
Attorneys for Respondents
Stephanie A. Webster
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld
1333 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

swebster@akingump.com
202-887-4000
Party name: Allina Health Services, et al.