No. 17-1476 | |
Title: | City of Fort Worth, Texas, et al., Petitioners v. Eric C. Darden |
Docketed: | April 27, 2018 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (16-11244) |
Decision Date: | January 24, 2018 |
Rehearing Denied: | February 27, 2018 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 23 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 29, 2018) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 30 2018 | Waiver of right of respondent Eric C. Darden to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
May 08 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018. |
May 14 2018 | Response Requested. (Due June 13, 2018) |
Jun 12 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 13, 2018 to July 13, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jun 19 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 13, 2018. |
Jul 13 2018 | Brief of respondent Eric C. Darden in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 30 2018 | Reply of petitioners City of Fort Worth, Texas, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 01 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018. |
Oct 01 2018 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Kenneth E. East Counsel of Record | The Law Office of Kenneth E. East 9001 Airport Freeway Suite 675 North Richland Hills, TX 76180 ken@east.law | 817-788-1111 |
Party name: City of Fort Worth, Texas, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Matthew Joseph Kita Counsel of Record | P.O. Box 5119 Dallas, TX 75208 matt@mattkita.com | 214-699-1863 |
Party name: Eric C. Darden |